|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 568, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6113.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5025.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4498.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4455.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|