California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2269 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016