|
09/14/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 353, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6043.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4982.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4463.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|