California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2274 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill August 10, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016