Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5522.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) .
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Page 5433.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 5179.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 2.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|