California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2280 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016