|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 266, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5701.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 4726.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4356.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|