California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2291 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill June 8, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016