Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|