California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2293 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Amended

Bill April 27, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016
Bill March 10, 2016