|
06/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5304.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4176.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4230.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|