California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2295 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill June 9, 2016

Chaptered

Bill June 27, 2016

Amended

Bill May 24, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016