California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2308 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill June 28, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016