LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2308
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2308
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2308
Compare Versions
AB2308 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB2308 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2308 Amended June 28, 2016
AB2308 Amended May 31, 2016
AB2308 Amended April 26, 2016
AB2308 Amended April 13, 2016
AB2308 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2308 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB2308 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2308 Amended June 28, 2016
AB2308 Amended May 31, 2016
AB2308 Amended April 26, 2016
AB2308 Amended April 13, 2016
AB2308 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare