Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2645.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2646.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1436.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|