California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB232 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 14, 2015