|
09/29/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6194.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5119.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4862.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|