California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2320 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016