|
09/16/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6136.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5048.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5181.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|