California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2324 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016