|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 616, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 15. Page 3135.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2693.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 10. Page 1373.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|