California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB234 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill June 9, 2015