|
09/13/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 330, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5055.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4680.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|