California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2362 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2016

Amended

Bill May 2, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016