|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 299, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 5064.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 5122.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|