California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2364 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill April 7, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016
Bill March 16, 2016