California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2375 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016