LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2375
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2375
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2375
Compare Versions
AB2375 Chaptered September 21, 2016
AB2375 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB2375 Amended August 8, 2016
AB2375 Amended June 20, 2016
AB2375 Amended May 4, 2016
AB2375 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2375 Chaptered September 21, 2016
AB2375 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB2375 Amended August 8, 2016
AB2375 Amended June 20, 2016
AB2375 Amended May 4, 2016
AB2375 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare