California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2376 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2016

Amended

Bill June 20, 2016
Bill March 9, 2016