LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2376
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2376
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2376
Compare Versions
AB2376 Chaptered August 17, 2016
AB2376 Enrolled August 2, 2016
AB2376 Amended June 20, 2016
AB2376 Amended March 9, 2016
AB2376 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2376 Chaptered August 17, 2016
AB2376 Enrolled August 2, 2016
AB2376 Amended June 20, 2016
AB2376 Amended March 9, 2016
AB2376 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare