|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 882, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6044.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4989.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4772.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4393.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|