California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2380 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016