|
09/29/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 6391.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5303.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 16. Page 4867.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4342.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|