California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2385 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill May 12, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016