|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 754, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 5. Page 5009.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 4782.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|