California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill May 9, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016