|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 252, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 5876.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4960.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 3502.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|