LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB241
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB241
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB241
Compare Versions
AB241 Chaptered September 9, 2016
AB241 Enrolled August 19, 2016
AB241 Amended June 21, 2016
AB241 Amended June 9, 2016
AB241 Amended June 1, 2016
AB241 Amended April 29, 2015
AB241 Introduced February 5, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB241 Chaptered September 9, 2016
AB241 Enrolled August 19, 2016
AB241 Amended June 21, 2016
AB241 Amended June 9, 2016
AB241 Amended June 1, 2016
AB241 Amended April 29, 2015
AB241 Introduced February 5, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare