Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 1863.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|