LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB243
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB243
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB243
Compare Versions
AB243 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB243 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB243 Amended September 11, 2015
AB243 Amended September 4, 2015
AB243 Amended September 1, 2015
AB243 Amended August 17, 2015
AB243 Amended July 2, 2015
AB243 Amended June 1, 2015
AB243 Amended April 22, 2015
AB243 Amended April 8, 2015
AB243 Introduced February 5, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB243 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB243 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB243 Amended September 11, 2015
AB243 Amended September 4, 2015
AB243 Amended September 1, 2015
AB243 Amended August 17, 2015
AB243 Amended July 2, 2015
AB243 Amended June 1, 2015
AB243 Amended April 22, 2015
AB243 Amended April 8, 2015
AB243 Introduced February 5, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare