|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 756, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 10. Page 6344.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5288.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 8. Page 4863.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4218.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|