California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2442 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016