California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2469 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016