BILL NUMBER: AB 2469ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 15, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 2, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Frazier FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to amend Section 5156.7 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2469, Frazier. Specialized license plates: breast cancer awareness. Under existing law, the Department of Motor Vehicles issues environmental and other specialized license plates. The issuance of some of those license plates is subject to additional fees. Existing law prohibits the department from establishing a specialized license plate program for a state agency until the department has received not less than 7,500 applications for the plates within 12 months after the date of the department's approval of the agency's initial application to sponsor a specialized license plate program. Existing law requires the State Department of Health Care Services to apply to the department, pursuant to those provisions, to sponsor a breast cancer awareness license plate program, pursuant to which the Department of Motor Vehicles is required to issue specialized license plates, if the State Department of Health Care Services complies with the applicable requirements. This bill would authorize the State Department of Health Care Services to contact the department by September 5, 2016, and indicate its intent to undertake collection of additional applications and fees or deposits for an additional period of 12 months in order to obtain the minimum 7,500 applications for a special license plate the State Department of Health Care Services is seeking to sponsor pursuant to existing law. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5156.7 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 5156.7. (a) (1) The State Department of Health Care Services shall apply to the department, pursuant to Section 5156, to sponsor a breast cancer awareness license plate program. The department shall issue specialized license plates for that program if the State Department of Health Care Services complies with the requirements of Section 5156. (2) Notwithstanding paragraph (2) of subdivision (b) of Section 5156, the State Department of Health Care Services, by September 5, 2016, may contact the department and indicate its intent to undertake collection of additional applications and fees or deposits for an additional period not to exceed 12 months in order to obtain the minimum 7,500 applications for a license plate it is sponsoring. (b) The State Department of Health Care Services may accept and use donated artwork from California artists for the license plate. (c) Notwithstanding subdivision (c) of Section 5157, the additional fees prescribed by Section 5157 for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of the specialized license plates shall be deposited, after the department deducts its administrative costs, in the Breast Cancer Control Account in the Breast Cancer Fund established pursuant to Section 30461.6 of the Revenue and Taxation Code. (d) It is the intent of the Legislature that the department, in consultation with the State Department of Health Care Services, will design and make available for issuance pursuant to this article special breast cancer awareness license plates. Specifically, it is the intent of the Legislature that the license plates issued pursuant to this section consist of a pink breast cancer awareness ribbon to the left of the numerical series and a breast cancer awareness message, such as, "Early Detection Saves Lives," below the numerical series. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to ensure a successful breast cancer awareness license plate program at the earliest possible time to provide additional funding for breast cancer awareness programs, it is necessary for this bill to take effect immediately.