|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 301, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5010.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4959.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|