California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2470 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016