|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 2605.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2145.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 1217.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|