California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill June 29, 2015
Bill June 10, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015