Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4871.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and AGING & L.T.C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|