California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2497 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016